CO HB1071 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
concerning the manner in which watercourses of the district are used for waste disposal.
Title
Colorado Department Of Public Health And Environment Water Quality Control
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 19-1071 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 19-1071 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 19-1071 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 19-1071 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Governor Signed | |
2019-02-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-02-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2019-01-31 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-01-30 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-01-29 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-01-28 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-01-24 | House | House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment |