CO HB1067 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Continuing Professional Development Psychologists

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Continuing Professional Development Psychologists

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1067 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 severed section B - Lines 5 through 8 (Attachment C) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 severed section A -- Lines 1 through 4 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1067 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1067 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1067 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1067 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-08HouseGovernor Signed
2015-03-30HouseSent to the Governor
2015-03-30HouseSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-03-27HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2015-03-23HouseHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2015-03-23HouseHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2015-03-19SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-03-18SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2015-03-17SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2015-03-13SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2015-02-26SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
2015-02-06SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2015-02-04HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-02-03HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-01-30HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2015-01-22HouseHouse Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2015-01-09HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FD8DB211B2329D3F87257D900077FCA0?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FD8DB211B2329D3F87257D900077FCA0/$FILE/1067_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FD8DB211B2329D3F87257D900077FCA0/$FILE/1067_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FD8DB211B2329D3F87257D900077FCA0/$FILE/1067_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FD8DB211B2329D3F87257D900077FCA0/$FILE/1067shhs_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FD8DB211B2329D3F87257D900077FCA0/$FILE/1067_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FD8DB211B2329D3F87257D900077FCA0/$FILE/1067_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FD8DB211B2329D3F87257D900077FCA0/$FILE/1067_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/01782BD3FE8D57DD87257DD50080E5A5
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/1453449F6E8EAE8987257DDD006C733B
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/01782BD3FE8D57DD87257DD50080E5A5
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/1453449F6E8EAE8987257DDD006C733B
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/4626E0B15886A80887257E07004D9137
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/96964E8685F3806287257E00006AA55B
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/3AF96A1960D4E08D87257E00006AC65C

Bill Comments

feedback