CO HB1066 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-10 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-10 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the establishment of contribution limits under the "Fair Campaign Practices Act" for candidates for school district director, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Contribution Limits School District Director Candidate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Postpone House Bill 20-1066 indefinitely. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1066, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1066, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1066, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1066, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1066, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1066, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1066, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1066, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1066, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1066, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2020-02-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-24 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-02-21 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-02-14 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-30 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-01-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |