CO HB1062 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning clarifications to the Colorado student free expression law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Colorado Student Free Expression Law

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 20-1062 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 20-1062, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 20-1062, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-24 Governor Signed
2020-03-23 Sent to the Governor
2020-03-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-03-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-10SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-09SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-04SenateSenate Committee on Education Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-02-13SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
2020-02-13HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-12HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-02-11HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-02-06HouseHouse Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-01-08HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Education

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1062
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1062_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1062_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1062_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1062_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1062_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1062_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/060b43bbb49e4a9b872585060083b434-hb20-1062-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1062vote5a0950
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/060b43bbb49e4a9b872585060083b434-hb20-1062-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7b3880fdd7143748872585210063f911-hb20-1062-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1062vote5bba52

Bill Comments

feedback