CO HB1051 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning human trafficking prevention training by the department of public safety.
Title
Colorado Department of Public Safety HumanTrafficking-related Training
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 55 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1051, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1051, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1051, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1051, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1051, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1051, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1051, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1051, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1051, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1051, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-13 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-04-29 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-04-27 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2019-04-26 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-04-17 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-16 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-16 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-17 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-01-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |