CO HB1046 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning measures to enhance child welfare system tools, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Child Welfare System Tools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1046 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.007) (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1046, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1046, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.007) (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1046, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1046, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2024-03-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2024-03-01 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-03-01 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-07 | House | House Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Human Services |