CO HB1039 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a transparent state web portal that allows the public to easily search for information relating to state agency rules at no cost.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transparent State Web Portal Search Rules

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 20-1039 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1039 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 20-1039, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 20-1039, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-24 Governor Signed
2020-03-23 Sent to the Governor
2020-03-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-03-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-14SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-13SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-11SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-03-02SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
2020-02-28HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-27HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2020-02-26HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-02-21HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-02-19HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Appropriations
2020-01-08HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor + Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1039
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1039_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1039_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1039_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1039_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1039_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1039_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/53dc175b5323c9ca87258513007e0e3d-hb20-1039-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2c4f355e89cf69018725851500538633-hb20-1039-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/53dc175b5323c9ca87258513007e0e3d-hb20-1039-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1039vote5b1ea2
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/15893eb0428edd2f87258528006cb692-hb20-1039-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1039vote54a90a

Bill Comments

feedback