CO HB1001 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning support for expanding broadband access for preschool through twelfth grade education, and, in connection therewith, creating the connecting Colorado students grant program and making an appropriation.
Title
Grants To Improve Internet Access In P-12 Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-02 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 51 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 54 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20B-1001 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20B-1001, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-30 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20B-1001 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-11-30 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20B-1001 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-11-30 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20B-1001 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 54 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20B-1001 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20B-1001, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-30 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20B-1001 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-11-30 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20B-1001 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-11-30 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20B-1001 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-07 | Governor Signed | |
2020-12-04 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-12-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-12-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-12-02 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2020-12-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2020-12-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-11-30 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2020-11-30 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-11-30 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2020-11-30 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |