CA SB958 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - April 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - April 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11011.24 of the Government Code, relating to state surplus property, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Surplus state property: County of Napa.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | April 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 3282.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Set for hearing March 12. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11011.24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |