CA SB946 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HUM. S.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HUM. S.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4204 and 17404.4 of the Family Code, relating to child support.
Title
Child support payments.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB946 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HUM. S. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3931.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3776.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | April 18 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3254.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 17404.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 4204 | Amended Code | Citation Text |