CA SB942 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 109, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 109, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to state claims, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
State claims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-05 - Assembly - SB 942 Lara Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB942 Lara Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB942 Lara Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 109, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-07-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-07-11 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-07-05 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 6108.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4334.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 1. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |