CA SB920 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-30 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-30 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12528 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 288, 368.6, 502.9, 515, 525, 861.5, 868.7, and 13515 of, and to amend the heading of Chapter 13 (commencing with Section 368) of Title 9 of Part 1 of, the Penal Code, and to amend Sections 15610.07, 15610.23, and 15630 of, to amend the heading of Article 8 (commencing with Section 15656) and the heading of Article 8.5 (commencing with Section 15657) of Chapter 11 of Part 3 of Division 9 of, and to amend the heading of Chapter 11 (commencing with Section 15600) of Part 3 of Division 9 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to persons with disabilities.
Title
Persons with disabilities: terminology.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2020-03-23 | Senate | March 23 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Set for hearing March 23. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12528 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13515 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 288 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 368.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 502.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 515 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 525 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 861.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 868.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 15610.07 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 15610.23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 15630 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB920 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB920 |