CA SB907 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on September 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 17144.5 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Personal income taxes: gross income exclusion: mortgage debt forgiveness.
Sponsors
Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] | Sen. Anthony Cannella [R] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Sen. Janet Nguyen [R] |
Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R] | Asm. Richard Gordon [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-31 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SB907 Galgiani Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-31 - Assembly - SB 907 Galgiani Third Reading Urgency By GONZALEZ (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB907 Galgiani Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-31 - Assembly - SB 907 Galgiani Third Reading Urgency By GONZALEZ (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB907 Galgiani Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2016-09-13 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2016-09-13 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2016-09-09 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2016-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5603.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-31 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6563.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 hearing. Held in committee and under submission. |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20). |
2016-06-20 | Assembly | June 20 set for first hearing. Placed on REV. & TAX. suspense file. |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4037.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3999.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | April 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Set for hearing April 11. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3334.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing March 30. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | March 16 hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Set for hearing March 16. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2016-01-26 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 25. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17144.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |