CA SB898 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Vetoed on September 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 6358.6 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Sales and use taxes: exemption: animal blood.
Sponsors
Sen. Janet Nguyen [R] | Asm. Travis Allen [R] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] | Sen. Benjamin Allen [D] |
Sen. Tom Berryhill [R] | Sen. Jeff Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB898 Nguyen (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Assembly - SB 898 Nguyen Senate Third Reading By ALLEN (Y: 70 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Special Consent #10 SB898 Nguyen (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Assembly - SB 898 Nguyen Senate Third Reading By ALLEN (Y: 70 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Special Consent #10 SB898 Nguyen (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2016-09-13 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2016-09-13 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2016-08-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5428.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 5. Page 5889.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 3.) (August 3). |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20). |
2016-06-20 | Assembly | June 20 set for first hearing. Placed on REV. & TAX. suspense file. |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4147.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3999.) (May 27). |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-05-02 | Senate | May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3609.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | April 27 hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 21. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6358.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |