CA SB895 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 704, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 704, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1569.33 and 1569.335 of, and to add Section 1569.331 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to residential care facilities for the elderly.
Title
Residential care facilities for the elderly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-27 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB895 Corbett Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Assembly - SB 895 Corbett Senate Third Reading By WIECKOWSKI (Y: 61 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB895 Corbett (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Assembly - SB 895 Corbett Senate Third Reading By WIECKOWSKI (Y: 61 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB895 Corbett (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 704, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-04 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 6. Page 4892.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 11. Page 6494.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 6343.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-06 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 17). |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3649.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3704.) (May 23). |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3119.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Set for hearing March 25. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 13. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1569.33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1569.331 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1569.335 | Amended Code | Citation Text |