CA SB893 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-08-15 - August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-08-15 - August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 5.1 (commencing with Section 11530) to Part 1 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to artificial intelligence.
Title
California Artificial Intelligence Research Hub.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Padilla [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Sen. Susan Rubio [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB893 Padilla et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB893 Padilla et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-15 | Assembly | August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2024-08-07 | Assembly | August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2024-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2024-06-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2024-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4117.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3962.) (May 16). |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3634.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 3527.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16 in JUD. pending receipt. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD. |
2024-01-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 3. |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11530 | New Code | See Bill Text |