CA SB875 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - April 26 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - April 26 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3041 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Crimes: parole.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Senate | April 26 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | April 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | (Ayes 31. Noes 6.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 24. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 3041 | Amended Code | Citation Text |