CA SB872 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 362, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 362, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 53069.8 of the Government Code, relating to local law enforcement.
Title
Local law enforcement: supplemental services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB872 Hall Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Assembly - SB 872 Hall Senate Third Reading By BLOOM (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 872 Hall Senate Third Reading Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-04 - Assembly - SB 872 Hall Senate Third Reading By BLOOM (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB872 Hall (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Assembly - SB 872 Hall Senate Third Reading By BLOOM (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 872 Hall Senate Third Reading Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-04 - Assembly - SB 872 Hall Senate Third Reading By BLOOM (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB872 Hall (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 362, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2016-08-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5475.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6272.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5975.) Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-08-04 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5714.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 29). |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3429.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3395.) (April 5). |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-01-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 14. |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53069.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |