CA SB87 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 72-22)
Status: Passed on February 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 7, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Article 8 (commencing with Section 12100.80) of Chapter 1.6 of Part 2 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, and to add and repeal Sections 17158 and 24312 of, and to add and repeal Article 8 (commencing with Section 19294) of Chapter 5 of Part 10.2 of Division 2 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to small businesses, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Small Business COVID-19 Relief Grant Program: income tax: gross income: exclusion: small business grants.

Sponsors

Sen. Anna Caballero [D]Sen. Dave Min [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Sen. Benjamin Allen [D]
Sen. Bob Archuleta [D]Sen. Toni Atkins [D]Sen. Patricia Bates [R]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]
Sen. Josh Becker [D]Asm. Steve Bennett [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]
Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Sen. Andreas Borgeas [R]
Sen. Steven Bradford [D]Asm. Lisa Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]
Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]
Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Sen. Dave Cortese [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]
Sen. Brian Dahle [R]Asm. Laurie Davies [R]Sen. Bill Dodd [D]Sen. Maria Durazo [D]
Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Sen. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]
Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Sen. Steve Glazer [D]
Sen. Lena Gonzalez [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Sen. Shannon Grove [R]Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D]
Asm. Chris Holden [D]Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D]Sen. Melissa Hurtado [D]Sen. Brian Jones [R]
Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Sen. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Sen. John Laird [D]
Asm. Marc Levine [D]Sen. Connie Leyva [D]Sen. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]
Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]
Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Sen. Mike McGuire [D]Sen. Melissa Melendez [R]
Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Sen. Josh Newman [D]Sen. Jim Nielsen [R]
Sen. Rosilicie Ochoa Bogh [R]Sen. Richard Pan [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]
Sen. Anthony Portantino [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]
Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Sen. Richard Roth [D]Sen. Susan Rubio [D]
Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Sen. Nancy Skinner [D]Sen. Henry Stern [D]
Asm. Philip Ting [D]Sen. Tom Umberg [D]Asm. Suzette Martinez Valladares [R]Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D]
Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D]
Sen. Scott Wiener [D]Sen. Scott Wilk [R]

Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - Assembly - SB 87 Caballero Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB87 Caballero et al. Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB87 Skinner (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 7, Statutes of 2021.
2021-02-23 Approved by the Governor.
2021-02-22 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m.
2021-02-22SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-02-22SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2021-02-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Senate.
2021-02-22AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2021-02-22AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2021-02-22AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 and 63 suspended.
2021-02-18AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-02-17AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2021-02-16AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 15. Page 328.)
2021-01-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2021-01-21AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-01-21SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 2. Page 89.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-01-15SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-01-15SenateOrdered to second reading.
2021-01-15SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 22. Noes 8. Page 76.)
2021-01-11SenateRead first time.
2020-12-17SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 16.
2020-12-16SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12100.80Repealed CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17158Repealed CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code24312Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback