CA SB828 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-21 - June 27 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-21 - June 27 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 2716.7 of the Penal Code, relating to corrections.
Title
Corrections: vocational training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB828 Smallwood-Cuevas (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-21 | Assembly | June 27 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | June 13 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1055.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 902.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 2716.7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |