CA SB826 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 188, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 27, 144, 5659, 6533, 6758, 7011.4, 7017.3, 7058.5, 7058.6, 7124.6, 7169, 7846, 8746, 9802, 19004, 19031, 19051, 19055, 19059.5, 19100, and 19161 of, and to repeal Section 13470.1 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to business and professions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Business and professions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-01 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB826 B.P.&E.D. (Roth) Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - SB 826 B., P. & E.D. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB826 B.P.&E.D (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-16 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 188, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-16 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-09 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
2021-09-01SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-08-26SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2021-08-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Senate.
2021-08-23AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2021-08-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 19).
2021-08-16AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-12AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2021-05-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2021-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-05-24SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1235.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2021-05-17SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2021-05-07SenateSet for hearing May 17.
2021-05-04SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-05-04SenateMay 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-04-30SenateSet for hearing May 10.
2021-04-26SenateRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-26SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2021-04-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 841.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2021-04-13SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2021-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 19.
2021-04-07SenateReferred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and GOV. & F.
2021-03-24SenateFrom printer.
2021-03-23SenateArticle IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 22, 2021, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
2021-03-23SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code13470.1Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code144Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19004Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19031Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19051Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19055Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19059.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19100Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19161Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code27Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code5659Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code6533Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code6758Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7011.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7017.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7058.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7058.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7124.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7169Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7846Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code8746Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code9802Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback