CA SB74 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 30, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 30, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 12838, 12838.1, and 15820.922 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 6025, 6025.1, 6126, 6126.2, 6126.3, 6126.6, 6129, and 6133 of, and to repeal Section 6131 of, the Penal Code, relating to corrections and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Corrections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-14 - Assembly - SB 74 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 59 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-06-14 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 2 SB74 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB74 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-14 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 2 SB74 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB74 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 30, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-06-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2013-06-14 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 1373.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-06-14 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 1983.) Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 14. Page 1984.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 892.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected May 9). |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12838 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12838.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 15820.922 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 6025 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 6025.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 6126 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 6126.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 6126.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 6126.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 6129 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 6131 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 6133 | Amended Code | Citation Text |