CA SB735 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6276.40 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 40520 of, and to add Sections 212, 213, 22368, 40518.1, 40518.5, and 40518.6 to, the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: speed photoimaging enforcement devices.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Rubio [D] | Sen. Josh Newman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | April 13 hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 13. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on TRANS. and JUD. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 6276.40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 212 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 213 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 22368 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 40518.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 40518.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 40518.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 40520 | Amended Code | Citation Text |