CA SB735 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-13 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-13 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 85351 to the Water Code, relating to the Sacramento-San Joaquin Delta Reform Act of 2009.
Title
Sacramento-San Joaquin Delta Reform Act of 2009: multispecies conservation plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB735 Wolk (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-13 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 1162.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1019.) (May 23). |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 642.) (April 23). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 85057.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 85351 | New Code | See Bill Text |