CA SB73 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 10 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-17 - Set for hearing March 9.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Hearing: Mar 9 @ 9:00 am in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 11370 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 29820 of, to repeal Section 1203.073 of, and to repeal and add Section 1203.07 of, the Penal Code, relating to probation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Probation: eligibility: crimes relating to controlled substances.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-17SenateSet for hearing March 9.
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-01-11SenateRead first time.
2020-12-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 10.
2020-12-10SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code11370Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1203.07New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code1203.073Repealed CodeCitation Text
Penal Code29820Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback