CA SB726 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-25 - Motion failed in committee (Ayes 3. Noes 4. Page 4953.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-25 - Motion failed in committee (Ayes 3. Noes 4. Page 4953.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2401 and 2401.1 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to medicine.
Title
Health care districts: rural hospitals: employment of
Sponsors
Sen. Roy Ashburn [R] | Asm. Wesley Chesbro [D] | Sen. Dave Cox [R] | Sen. Denise Ducheny [D] |
Asm. Sandre Swanson [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-06-28 - Assembly - SB 726 Ashburn Assembly Third Reading By SWANSON (Y: 43 N: 24 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-17 - Assembly - SB 726 Ashburn Senate Third Reading By SWANSON (Y: 38 N: 26 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Health (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB726 Ashburn (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-28 - Assembly - SB 726 Ashburn Assembly Third Reading By SWANSON (Y: 43 N: 24 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-17 - Assembly - SB 726 Ashburn Senate Third Reading By SWANSON (Y: 38 N: 26 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Health (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB726 Ashburn (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-25 | Motion failed in committee (Ayes 3. Noes 4. Page 4953.) | |
2010-08-20 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 4717.) Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2010-07-01 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. | |
2010-06-28 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2010-06-28 | Reconsideration granted. (Page 5841.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 43. Noes 24. Page 5854.) To Senate. | |
2010-06-21 | Motion to reconsider continued to June 28. | |
2010-06-17 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 38. Noes 26. Page 5703.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Swanson. | |
2010-05-17 | From inactive file to third reading file. | |
2010-05-13 | Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Charles Calderon. | |
2009-09-11 | Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Torrico. | |
2009-08-31 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) (Received by Desk on August 28 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(11).) Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-08-20 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-15 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-14 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on July 9.) | |
2009-07-09 | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 2432.) | |
2009-07-07 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. (Heard in committee on July 7.) | |
2009-06-30 | Set, first hearing. Further hearing to be set. | |
2009-06-15 | To Coms. on B. & P. and HEALTH. | |
2009-06-01 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-06-01 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 3. Page 1093.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-28 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-27 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 1. Page 1026.) | |
2009-05-20 | Set for hearing May 26. (For vote only.) | |
2009-05-18 | Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | |
2009-05-08 | Set for hearing May 18. | |
2009-05-06 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-05 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 730.) | |
2009-04-28 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 676.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-04-23 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. Set for hearing April 29 in HEALTH pending receipt. | |
2009-04-22 | Set for hearing April 27. | |
2009-04-13 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-03-25 | Set for hearing April 13. | |
2009-03-19 | To Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and HEALTH. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-02-28 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |