CA SB674 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 875, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 875, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Chapter 6.8 (commencing with Section 6980) of Part 1 of Division 2 of the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Public Contracts: workforce development: covered public contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - SB 674 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Cervantes (Y: 61 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB674 Durazo et al. Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB674 Durazo et al (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB674 Durazo et al. Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB674 Durazo et al (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 875, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 5380.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 11). |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2022-08-10 | Assembly | August 10 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-08-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on L. & E. and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 and 78 suspended. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Cervantes. |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Chau. |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 26). |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-07-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (July 5). |
2021-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and TRANS. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 1327.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1200.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | May 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 10. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 2. Page 943.) (April 27). |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 574.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and TRANS. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 6980 | New Code | See Bill Text |