CA SB655 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-09-04 - Read third time. Amended. (Page 3040.) Re-referred to Com. On REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-09-04 - Read third time. Amended. (Page 3040.) Re-referred to Com. On REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6369 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Sales and use taxes: exemption: diabetic supplies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB655 Padilla (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB655 Padilla (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-09-04 | Read third time. Amended. (Page 3040.) Re-referred to Com. On REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. | |
2009-09-03 | From inactive file to third reading file. | |
2009-09-02 | Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Torrico. | |
2009-08-24 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Torrico. | |
2009-08-20 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 19.) | |
2009-07-06 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 6.) | |
2009-06-18 | To Com. on U. & C. | |
2009-06-03 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-06-03 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 1175.) To Assembly. | |
2009-06-01 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. (Received by Desk on May 29 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(5).) Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-20 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-19 | Set for hearing May 26. | |
2009-05-18 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-05-08 | Set for hearing May 18. | |
2009-04-29 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-28 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 584.) | |
2009-03-25 | Set for hearing April 21. | |
2009-03-19 | To Com. on E., U. & C. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-02-28 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |