CA SB603 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-06 - Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-06 - Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1950.5 of the Civil Code, relating to landlord and tenant.
Title
Landlord and tenant: security deposit.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Leno [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB603 Leno Reconsider (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB603 Leno (Y: 13 N: 18 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB603 Leno (Y: 13 N: 18 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-06 | Senate | Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Corbett. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 13. Noes 18. Page 1188.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Leno. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1188.) |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 852.) (May 7). |
2013-04-29 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 7. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1950.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |