CA SB58 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-14 - Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Santiago.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-14 - Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Santiago.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 25631 of, and to add and repeal Section 25634 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Alcoholic beverages: hours of sale.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] | Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] | Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D] | Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D] |
Asm. Chad Mayes [I] | Asm. Jay Obernolte [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-14 - Assembly - SB 58 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Santiago (Y: 29 N: 35 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB58 Wiener et al (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB58 Wiener et al (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-14 | Assembly | Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Santiago. |
2019-09-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 29. Noes 35. Page 3615.) |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (August 30). |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | (Received at desk July 10 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)). |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 6. Page 1181.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1088.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4. Page 332.) (March 12). |
2019-03-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Set for hearing March 12. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Read first time. |
2018-12-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 17. |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 25631 | New Code | See Bill Text |