CA SB562 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1374.73 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 10144.51 of the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: pervasive developmental disorders or autism.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - SB 562 Portantino Senate Third Reading By Bauer-Kahan (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB562 Portantino Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB562 Portantino (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB562 Portantino Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB562 Portantino (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-27 | Senate | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2022-09-27 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5419.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 and 78 suspended. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Bauer-Kahan. |
2021-09-10 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes. |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 22). |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1324.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1197.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | May 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Set for hearing May 10. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 877.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 21. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 685.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and HEALTH. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and HUMAN S. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1374.73 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10144.51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |