CA SB544 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 152, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 152, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6060 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to attorneys.
Title
State Bar: admission: license: moral character review: mental health medical records.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Umberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-07-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB544 Umberg Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - SB 544 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Wicks (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB544 Umberg (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - SB 544 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Wicks (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB544 Umberg (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 152, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-07-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-07-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2058.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-07-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-07-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2569.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 4). |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1009.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 906.) (April 30). |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 6060 | Amended Code | Citation Text |