CA SB541 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 718, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 718, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5102, 5317.5, 5352, 5359, and 5387 of, to add Sections 1046 and 5417.5 to, and to add and repeal Sections 918.1 and 918.2 of, the Public Utilities Code, and to amend Section 14602.9 of the Vehicle Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Public Utilities Commission: for-hire transportation carriers: enforcement.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB541 Hill Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - SB 541 Hill Senate Third Reading By RENDON (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB541 Hill (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - SB 541 Hill Senate Third Reading By RENDON (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB541 Hill (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 718, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-15 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:30 a.m. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2669.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2963.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-08-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14). |
2015-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and PUB. S. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1303.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1156.) (May 28). |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | May 26 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 26. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | May 18 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 795.) (April 27). |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 1046 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 309.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 5102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 5317.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 5352 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 5359 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 5387 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 5411.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 5417.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 918.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 918.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 14602.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |