CA SB513 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 241 and 243 of the Penal Code, relating to assault and battery.
Title
Assault and battery of a public utility worker.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-31 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # SB513 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-24 - Assembly - SB 513 Bradford Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB513 Bradford (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-24 - Assembly - SB 513 Bradford Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB513 Bradford (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-03 | Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2017-10-04 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2017-10-04 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2352.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-08-29 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-08-24 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2769.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-07-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-07-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 19). |
2017-07-10 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1342.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Published May 26 at 9 p.m. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1186.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | April 17 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 514.) (March 28). |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 241 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 243 | Amended Code | Citation Text |