CA SB504 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 51182 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 4124.5 and 4291 of the Public Resources Code, relating to fire prevention.
Title
Wildfires: defensible space: grant programs: local governments.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-04 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB504 Dodd (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2023-05-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1004.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 801.) (April 18). |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 51182 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4124.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4291 | Amended Code | Citation Text |