CA SB467 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2807 of the Penal Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Public contracts: Prison Industry Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-01 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2010-01-11 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-01-04 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-28 | Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |
2009-05-22 | Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |
2009-04-27 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2009-04-17 | Set for hearing April 27. | |
2009-04-14 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 478.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-03-27 | Set for hearing April 14. | |
2009-03-12 | To Com. on G.O. | |
2009-02-27 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |