CA SB453 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 386, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 386, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 4.9 (commencing with Section 89455) to Part 55 of Division 8 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to agriculture, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
California State University Agricultural Research Institute grant program: Agricultural Biosecurity Fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Melissa Hurtado [D] | Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D] | Sen. Andreas Borgeas [R] | Sen. Anna Caballero [D] |
Sen. Susan Eggman [D] | Asm. Jim Patterson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-08-30 - Senate - Special Consent SB453 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - SB 453 Hurtado Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent SB453 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - SB 453 Hurtado Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent SB453 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 386, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-03 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2244.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-08-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-08-19 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2440.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-07-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 14). |
2021-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and HIGHER ED. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1350.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1192.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | April 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 703.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 7. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 552.) (March 18). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Set for hearing March 18. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and ED. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 89455 | New Code | See Bill Text |