CA SB414 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 609, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 609, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8670.12, 8670.13, 8670.28, and 8670.67.5 of, and to add Sections 8670.11, 8670.13.3, and 8670.55.1 to, the Government Code, relating to oil spill response.
Title
Oil spill response.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB414 Jackson Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - SB 414 Jackson Senate Third Reading By WILLIAMS (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Governmental Organization (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB414 Jackson (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - SB 414 Jackson Senate Third Reading By WILLIAMS (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Governmental Organization (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB414 Jackson (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 609, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-16 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m. |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 2751.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Set for hearing September 10. |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2015-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2953.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-09-04 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2015-08-26 | Assembly | August 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-08-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 15). |
2015-07-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 29). |
2015-06-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and G.O. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 633.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 525.) (April 7). |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 7. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |