CA SB41 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 2, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 2, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 512.2 to the Labor Code, relating to employment, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Meal and rest breaks: airline cabin crew employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - Assembly - SB 41 Cortese Third Reading Urgency By Kalra (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB41 Cortese Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB41 Cortese Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 2, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-03-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-03-21 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2023-03-16 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 690.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-03-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-03-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 14). |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2023-02-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 264.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 190.) (February 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Set for hearing February 14. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 171.) (February 9). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Set for hearing February 9. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD. |
2022-12-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5. |
2022-12-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 512.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |