CA SB379 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 608, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 608, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65302 of the Government Code, relating to land use.
Title
Land use: general plan: safety element.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-01 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB379 Jackson Concurrence (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-31 - Assembly - SB 379 Jackson Senate Third Reading By GORDON (Y: 55 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB379 Jackson (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-31 - Assembly - SB 379 Jackson Senate Third Reading By GORDON (Y: 55 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB379 Jackson (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 608, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-03 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:45 p.m. |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 15. Page 2369.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 25. Page 2683.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 19). |
2015-07-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 1). |
2015-06-22 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 16. Page 1287.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 858.) (April 29). |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 618.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E.Q. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65302 | Amended Code | Citation Text |