CA SB378 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 677, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 65964.5 to the Government Code, relating to local government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local government: broadband infrastructure development project permit processing: microtrenching permit processing ordinance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-02 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB378 Gonzalez et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Assembly - SB 378 Gonzalez Senate Third Reading By Quirk (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Communications and Conveyance] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB378 Gonzalez et al (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Energy, Utilities and Communications] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 677, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-09 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
2021-09-02SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-08-31SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2021-08-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2021-08-23AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 19).
2021-07-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-29AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on C. & C.
2021-06-14AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on C. & C.
2021-06-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 9).
2021-05-28AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. GOV. and C. & C.
2021-05-20AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-05-20SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1129.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-17SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2021-05-07SenateSet for hearing May 17.
2021-05-04SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-05-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 915.) (April 26).
2021-04-16SenateSet for hearing April 26.
2021-04-12SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2021-04-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E., U. & C. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 727.) (April 8).
2021-03-24SenateSet for hearing April 8.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-17SenateReferred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E., U. & C.
2021-02-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
2021-02-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code65964.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback