CA SB359 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11545 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicle dismantling.
Title
Automobile dismantling: enforcement.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Umberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB359 Umberg (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB359 Umberg (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-03-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-06-27 | Assembly | June 27 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3.) Reconsideration granted. |
2023-06-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-06-13 | Assembly | June 13 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-05-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1004.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 802.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 11545 | Amended Code | Citation Text |