CA SB357 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-12 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Davies.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-12 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Davies.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7930.180 of the Government Code, to repeal Section 103900 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 12806 of, to add Article 7 (commencing with Section 13030) to Chapter 1 of Division 6 to, and to repeal Section 13030 of, the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: physician and surgeon reporting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB357 Portantino et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB357 Portantino et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-12 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Davies. |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2023-08-16 | Assembly | August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2023-07-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-06-27 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and JUD. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1253.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1167.) (May 18). |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 892.) (April 25). |
2023-04-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 689.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 11. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and JUD. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 7930.180 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 103900 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 12806 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 13030 | New Code | See Bill Text |