CA SB347 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - June 19 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Privacy and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - June 19 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Privacy and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 21012 of, and to add Part 1.5 (commencing with Section 21750) to Division 9 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to aviation.
Title
State Remote Piloted Aircraft Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB347 Jackson (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | June 19 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-27 | Assembly | June 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and TRANS. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 1316.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1182.) (May 25). |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | May 15 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 855.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 627.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and PUB. S. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 21012 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 21750 | New Code | See Bill Text |