CA SB316 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-30 - August 30 set for first hearing.Testimony taken.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-30 - August 30 set for first hearing.Testimony taken.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 6072 and 6073 of, and to add Sections 6073.1 and 6073.2 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to attorneys.
Title
Attorneys: pro bono legal aid services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB316 Wieckowski (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB316 Wieckowski (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-30 | Assembly | August 30 set for first hearing.Testimony taken. |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (July 11). |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | June 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 1260.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | May 15 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 852.) (April 25). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | April 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 6072 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6073 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6073.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6073.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |