CA SB302 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 290, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 290, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12012.103 to the Government Code, relating to tribal gaming, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Tribal gaming: compact ratification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB302 Dodd et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 302 Dodd Third Reading Urgency By Bigelow (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB302 G.O (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 302 Dodd Third Reading Urgency By Bigelow (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB302 G.O (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 290, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2555.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Urgency clause adopted. |
2021-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2898.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Frazier. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-16 | Assembly | August 19 hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 612.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 420.) (March 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Set for hearing March 9. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12012.103 | New Code | See Bill Text |