CA SB249 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 176, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 176, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 120395 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to vaccinations.
Title
Vaccinations: meningococcal disease.
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Cox [R] | Asm. Tom Torlakson [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-09-09 - Senate - Special Consent #20 SB249 Cox (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-02 - Assembly - SB 249 Cox Senate Third Reading By TORLAKSON (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-18 - Senate - Special Consent #5 SB249 Cox (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-02 - Assembly - SB 249 Cox Senate Third Reading By TORLAKSON (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-18 - Senate - Special Consent #5 SB249 Cox (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 176, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by Governor. | |
2009-09-25 | Enrolled. To Governor at 10:30 a.m. | |
2009-09-09 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2340.) To enrollment. | |
2009-09-08 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-09-03 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2009-09-02 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2883.) To Senate. | |
2009-08-20 | Read third time. Amended. (Page 2670.) To third reading. | |
2009-07-13 | From Consent Calendar to third reading. | |
2009-07-09 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-07-08 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 8.) | |
2009-07-01 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 30.) | |
2009-06-02 | To Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-05-18 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-05-18 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 930.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-14 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-05-13 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-12 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2009-05-01 | Set for hearing May 11. | |
2009-04-28 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. | |
2009-04-27 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |
2009-04-23 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 556.) | |
2009-03-19 | Set for hearing April 15. | |
2009-03-09 | To Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-02-25 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |
2009-02-24 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |