CA SB23 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Set for hearing March 16.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Hearing: Mar 16 @ 1:30 pm in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 803 of the Penal Code, relating to disorderly conduct.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disorderly conduct: distribution of intimate images: statute of limitations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24SenateSet for hearing March 16.
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR.
2020-12-08SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
2020-12-07SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code803Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback