CA SB223 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 5.7 (commencing with Section 11160) to Division 2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to local government finance.
Title
Voter-approved local assessment: vehicles.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Leno [D] | Asm. Fiona Ma [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB223 Leno Concurrence (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Assembly - SB 223 Leno Senate Third Reading By MA (Y: 44 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Revenue and Taxation (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB223 Leno (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Assembly - SB 223 Leno Senate Third Reading By MA (Y: 44 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Revenue and Taxation (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB223 Leno (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained. | |
2011-10-04 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2011-10-04 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2011-09-16 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m. | |
2011-09-09 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 2459.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-09-07 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 44. Noes 30. Page 3018.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-08-31 | Read third time and amended. (Page 2712.) Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-26 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (August 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-17 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-07-11 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-07 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (July 6). | |
2011-06-28 | Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. | |
2011-06-23 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2011-06-13 | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and REV. & TAX. | |
2011-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-06-01 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 1225.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-27 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-26 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 1114.) (May 26). | |
2011-05-20 | Set for hearing May 26. | |
2011-05-09 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-04-29 | Set for hearing May 9. | |
2011-04-27 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 761.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-08 | Set for hearing April 27. | |
2011-03-30 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 496.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2011-03-04 | Set for hearing March 29. | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F. | |
2011-02-10 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. | |
2011-02-09 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 11160 | New Code | See Bill Text |