CA SB20 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 167, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 167, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 69519.3 of the Education Code, relating to student nutrition.
Title
Student nutrition: eligibility for CalFresh benefits.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. Laurie Davies [R] | Sen. Susan Rubio [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-08 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB20 Dodd et al. Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-04 - Assembly - SB 20 Dodd Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB20 Dodd et al (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-04 - Assembly - SB 20 Dodd Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB20 Dodd et al (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 167, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-08-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m. | |
2022-08-08 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4675.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-04 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5756.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-06-09 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | June 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2022-01-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 2724.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-03 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-01-03 | Senate | From inactive file on motion of Senator Dodd. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Dodd. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1179.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | April 5 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 666.) (March 10). |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Set for hearing March 10. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-12-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7. |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 69519.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |